Owen, Carolyn Jane (CPSO#: 76462)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 Jan 2006 to 30 Jan 2006
Elective Trainee - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2013