Owen, Robert Lindsay (CPSO#: 23914)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of London, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1978
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2003