Owens, Deyzi Edieva (CPSO#: 99935)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Mar 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
500 Manning Rd Ste 6C
Tecumseh ON  N8X 2S2
Phone: 519 979 5171
Fax: 5199795141
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deyzi Owens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Owens ( CPSO# 99935 )

Business Address:
6C - 500 Manning Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 5H3
Phone Number: (519) 979-5171

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Aug 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2013 to 31 Mar 2013
Elective Trainee - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 06 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Deyzi Edieva Owens may practise medicine independently in family medicine.