Owoeye, Olabisi Idowu (CPSO#: 102557)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Dec 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:Obafemi Awolowo University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall
K6H 5S5
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: 6139384240 Ext. 4628
Fax: 6139364679
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Precision Medical Centre
104-613, Longfields Dr.
Barrhaven, Ottawa
Ottawa ON  K2J 6J2
Canada
Phone: 6134407762
Fax: 6134408762
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Olabisi Owoeye Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Owoeye ( CPSO# 102557)

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Business Address:
Precision Medical Centre
104 - 613 Longfields Drive
Ottawa ON  K2J 6J2
Phone Number: (613) 440-7762

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 02 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Olabisi Idowu Owoeye may practise medicine independently in psychiatry,
            only.