Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Owolabi, Titus Ambrose Olu (CPSO#: 25478)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 15 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Feb 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013