Oyewumi, Lamide Bamidele Mofoluke (CPSO#: 88421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 140
1780 Markham Road
Scarborough, ON
Scarborough ON  M1B 2W2
Phone: 416-286-3830 Ext. 4
Fax: (416) 286-3133
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 416-281-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lamide Oyewumi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Oyewumi ( CPSO# 88421 )

Business Address:
Unit 140
1780 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 286-3830

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAMIDE BAMIDELE MOFOLUKE OYEWUMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OYEWUMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 26 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 27 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2013