Oyewumi, Modupe Tolunimi (CPSO#: 95616)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Suite 105
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone: (905) 472-6511
Fax: 9054725436
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Modupe Oyewumi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Oyewumi ( CPSO# 95616 )

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
105 - 110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 472-6511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MODUPE TOLUNIMI OYEWUMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OYEWUMI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016