Oza, Amit Manulal (CPSO#: 65839)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
BRAS Family Drug Development Prog
Suite 700U, 7-925
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Oza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Oza ( CPSO# 65839 )
Dr. S. Oza ( CPSO# 71509 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
BRAS Family Drug Development Prog
Suite 700U, 7-925
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2818

Business Address:
1450 O'Connor Drive
Unit 10, Building 1
Toronto ON  M4B 2T8
Phone Number: (416) 800-9032

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIT MANULAL OZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OZA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1994