Ozon, Pierre (CPSO#: 71210)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
P O Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Alliston Walk In Clinic
30 Dunham Drive
Alliston ON  L9R 0G1
Canada
Phone: (705) 434-2141
Fax: (705) 434-4582
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIERRE OZON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OZON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1999