Ozturker, Can (CPSO#: 108469)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Istanbul University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Turkey

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 11 Jan 2016 to 01 Apr 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 02 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 10 Jan 2017
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 11 Jan 2017 to 15 Mar 2017
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Mar 2017