Concerns
Source:
FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Discipline Findings in Other Jurisdictions
Active Date: August 23, 2018
Summary:
“On February 23, 2018, the New Jersey State Board of Medical Examiners ordered a suspension, without a hearing, of Dr. Kagoma’s license to practice medicine and surgery in the State of New Jersey. This order was issued after the New Jersey State Board of Medical Examiners received notice of the specified continuing education and remediation program (SCERP) ordered by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario in June 8, 2016 (see Concerns for more information on the College’s action). Dr. Kagoma’s license lapsed in New Jersey in 1989 due to failure to renew. The CPSO was notified of this order by a report dated May 3, 2018.
The New Jersey State Board of Medical Examiners has stated this order of summary suspension is administrative and is not considered to be a disciplinary action against Dr. Kagoma’s licence.”
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 8, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Kagoma has completed all requirements of the SCERP effective September 27, 2018
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP.
Download Full Document (PDF)