Pace, Kenneth Tony (CPSO#: 68126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
61 Queen Street East
Suite 9-106Q
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3695
Fax: (416) 867-3675
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth Pace Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Pace ( CPSO# 68126 )
Dr. J. Curtis ( CPSO# 68097 )

Business Address:
Suite 9 - 106
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3695

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH TONY PACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PACE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999