Pace, Paolo Giovanni (CPSO#: 106412)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: 519 621 2330
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 24 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAOLO GIOVANNI PACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PACE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2017