Pacheco Blandino, Ivan Ivan (CPSO#: 88484)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese, Spanish

Education:Univ. Nacional Autonoma de Nicaragua, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Pathology
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Ext. 2122
Fax: (519) 376-4413
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I. Pacheco Blandino Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Pacheco Blandino ( CPSO# 88484 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nicaragua

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IVAN IVAN PACHECO BLANDINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PACHECO BLANDINO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2013