Pachulski, Roman Thomas (CPSO#: 54678)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 03 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005