Packer, Richard Todd (CPSO#: 56954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Mar 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Mar 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
512-1 Young St
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone: (905) 318-3877
Fax: (905) 318-0016
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Richard and Tamar Packer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Packer ( CPSO# 56954 )
Dr. T. Packer ( CPSO# 57997 )

Business Address:
Suite 512
1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 318-3877

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD TODD PACKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PACKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2001