Paddock, Vernon Walter (CPSO#: 57971)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994