Paddon, Robert Charles (CPSO#: 58423)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SRS Consultants Inc
827 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3H7
Phone: (519) 858-4694
Fax: (519) 858-4692
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT CHARLES PADDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PADDON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1988