Padgett, Richard William Walter (CPSO#: 30374)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St Joseph's Healthcare 100 West 5th Street Hamilton, ON L8N 3K7
Date Received: 23 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017