Padilla, Paciencia (CPSO#: 27817)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2007