Padmore, Lloyd Gregory (CPSO#: 24412)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jan 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Oct 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 29 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 12 Jun 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 12 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from June 12, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Lloyd Gregory
            Padmore, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Padmore to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Padmore has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                  jurisdictions.
                  
                  
                  
                  
            As from October 5, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Lloyd Gregory
            Padmore, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Padmore to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                       DR. LLOYD GREGORY PADMORE
                                            ("Dr. Padmore")

                                                  to

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Padmore, certificate of registration number 24412, am a member of
                  the College.  I acknowledge that clinical deficiencies in my practice
                  have been identified. I am aware of the College's concern about
                  protecting the public. I acknowledge the nature of the College's
                  concerns.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Padmore, undertake that, effective immediately, my practice
                        will be restricted to office-based obstetrics and gynaecology.  I
                        may not practise family medicine.
                  
            (4)   Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Padmore, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall post
                        a sign in the waiting room(s) of all my Practice Locations, in a
                        clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at
                        Appendix "A."  For further clarity, this sign shall state as
                        follows:
                  
                        "Dr. Padmore is an obstetrician/gynecologist and must restrict his
                        practice to office obstetrics and gynecology. He may not practise
                        family medicine.  Further information may be found on the College
                        of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Padmore, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in any
                        language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section 4(a) in the waiting room(s) of all my Practice Locations,
                        in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at
                        Appendix "A." 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Padmore, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section 4(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  
            (5)   I, Dr. Padmore, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                  location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited
                  to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                  (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days of
                  executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform
                  the College of any and all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15)
                  days of commencing practice at that location.

            (6)   I, Dr. Padmore, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a
                  College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with
                  the provisions of this Undertaking.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Padmore, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (8)   I, Dr. Padmore, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (9)   I, Dr. Padmore, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (10)  I, Dr. Padmore, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Padmore's practice is restricted to office-based obstetrics and
                        gynaecology.  He may not practise family medicine.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Padmore, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Padmore, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Padmore, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information arising from the
                  monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. Padmore, give my irrevocable consent to any Chief of Staff to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, all information relevant to
                  this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

            (15)  I, Dr. Padmore, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately, and acknowledge that a breach by me of any
                  provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional
                  misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the
                  following: consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or
                  further action by the College, including a referral of specified
                  allegations to the Discipline Committee.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 5, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Lloyd Gregory Padmore to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 5, 2016:

Dr. Padmore’s practice is restricted to office-based obstetrics and gynaecology. He may not practise family medicine.


Source: QA Committee
Active Date: August 25, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (SCERP) Summary:

On August 25, 2016, the Quality Assurance Committee (“QAC”) required gynecologist, Dr. Lloyd Padmore, to complete a specified continuing education and remediation program (“SCERP”). The SCERP requires Dr. Padmore to:

• Practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months;

• Attend and successfully complete the medical record-keeping course offered at the University of Toronto as well as a College-approved course regarding obstetrics, gynecology and infertility;

• Provide a written summary of each policy, guideline or tool with reference to how it is applicable to office gynecology, including:

o CPSO Medical Records policy #4-12
o SOGC guidelines (prenatal genetic screening, pelvic masses, risk of malignancy index and use of CA 125 in diagnosing ovarian cancer)
o Choosing Wisely materials regarding indications for ordering tests, relevant to the practice of Obstetrics and Gynecology
o CMPA modules in record-keeping
o CPSO Practice Guide

• Undergo a reassessment with an assessor selected by the College, approximately three months following the completion of the Education Plan.