Padmore, Ruth Frances (CPSO#: 51349)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 71733
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 11 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Hematological Pathology Effective: 30 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUTH FRANCES PADMORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PADMORE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 1985