Padmos, Martin Andrew (CPSO#: 26409)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Apr 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal College of Physicians
774 Echo Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5N8
Phone: (613) 730-6205
Fax: (613) 730-8250
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 23 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN ANDREW PADMOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PADMOS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1974