Padonou, Michael Kweku (CPSO#: 55718)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 896-8996
Fax: (905) 896-8199
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Padonou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Douglas ( CPSO# 55470 )
Dr. M. Padonou ( CPSO# 55718 )

Business Address:
101 Queensway West
Suite 208
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 896-8996

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL KWEKU PADONOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PADONOU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1987