Paek, Laurence (CPSO#: 111460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5554
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 19 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURENCE PAEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAEK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2017