Paek, Wusun (CPSO#: 58104)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8711 - 700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 3120
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gnam and Paek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Paek ( CPSO# 58104 )
Dr. W. Gnam ( CPSO# 60016 )

Business Address:
TS Medical Centre
692 Euclid Avenue
Toronto ON  M6G 2T9
Phone Number: (416) 901-9020

Business Address:
Suite 8711
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WUSUN PAEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1988