Pagacz, Alexis Antoine (CPSO#: 41513)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Montreal, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Apr 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Dec 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 07 Dec 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 May 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 May 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Mar 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2013