Page, Alexandre (CPSO#: 104201)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Kentucky, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus. 501 Smyth Road, Ottawa, ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 06 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2015