Page, Robert John (CPSO#: 25553)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: City Centre Healthcare 1400 Windsor Ave Windsor ON N8X 3L9
Date Received: 27 Apr 2017


Address: City Centre Health Care 1400 Windsor Avenue Windsor ON N8X 3L9 Tel: 519-971-0116
Date Received: 21 Dec 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017