Page, Vesna (CPSO#: 67802)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 1999

Summary

Former Name: Njegovan, Vesna (used until: 07 Mar 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5178
Fax: (905) 813-4229
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vesna Page Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Page ( CPSO# 67802 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (416) 459-0542

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 17 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VESNA PAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAGE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1999