Pageau, Paul Gerard (CPSO#: 73553)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL GERARD PAGEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAGEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2001