Pahapill, Peter Ain (CPSO#: 65411)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9200 W. Wisconsin Avenue
Milwaukee WI  53226
United States
Phone: (414) 805-5400
Fax: (414) 955-0115

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota
USA - Ohio
USA - Pennsylvania
USA - Wisconsin

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 13 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER AIN PAHAPILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAHAPILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Jul 1997
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993