Pai, Nikhil (CPSO#: 87227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Konkani

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
HSC 3A21
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75637
Fax: 905-521-2655
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Pai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Pai ( CPSO# 87227 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Science Centre
Suite 3A21
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 08 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIKHIL PAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2014