Paikin, Sarah (CPSO#: 62554)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1991

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Polish, Yiddish

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (647) 348-2688
Fax: (416) 247-3463
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH PAIKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAIKIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1991

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 Jul 2002
Summary:

 On July 30, 2002, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Paikin(s guilty plea to the allegation that 
 she was found guilty of an offence relevant to her suitability to practice medicine.  Dr. Paikin 
 had plead guilty previously in court to the provincial offence of breaching the Health Insurance 
 Act by overbilling OHIP in the amount of approximately $10,000.  This offence was a regulatory 
 offence and not a criminal offence.

The Discipline Committee imposed the penalty of a recorded 
 reprimand and a fine of $3,000.  In addition, costs in the amount of $2,500 to the College was 
 imposed.  The fine and costs were ordered payable within 30 days.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 30, 2002

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 12, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)