Pain, Clare Margaret (CPSO#: 55389)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Sep 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8890
Fax: (416) 586-8654
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLARE MARGARET PAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1992 to 31 Aug 1993
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1986