Paine, Pauline Jean (CPSO#: 59780)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 09 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2017