Paitich, Cameron Bruce (CPSO#: 58138)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 48
2140 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 874-1759
Fax: (905) 874-1652
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Bruce Paitich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Paitich ( CPSO# 58138 )

Business Address:
Unit 48
2140 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 874-1759

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAMERON BRUCE PAITICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAITICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1988