Pak, Pui-Lung (CPSO#: 22264)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:National Defense Medical Center, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011