Pakes, Eddy Hymie (CPSO#: 21893)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Oct 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 1969

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3910 Bathurst street suite 306
Willowdale ON  M3H 5Z3
Phone: (416) 497-0447
Fax: (416) 497-7365
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDDY HYMIE PAKES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAKES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1969
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2000
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 10 Oct 2000

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 May 2000
Summary:

 On May 25, 2000 the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Pakes( plea of guilty to professional 
 misconduct in that he had been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to 
 practise and the Committee found him guilty of said charge.

On August 8, 2000, the Discipline 
 Committee released its decision and reasons on penalty and ordered the following:

a)	Dr. Pakes be 
 reprimanded and that the reprimand be recorded on the Register
b)	The Registrar is directed to 
 suspend Dr. Pakes( certificate of registration for a period of three months, to commence on a date 
 to be fixed by the Registrar
c)	Dr. Pakes shall pay a fine of $10,000.00 to the Minister of 
 Finance within 30 days of commencing his suspension
d)	Dr. Pakes shall pay costs to the Colege in 
 the amount of $2500.00 within 30 days of commencing his suspension
e)	Two months of the suspension 
 ordered shall be suspended, provided that paragraphs (c) and (d) above are complied with
f)	In the 
 event that Dr. Pakes fails to comply with paragraphs (c) or (d), then the balance of his 
 suspension will be served to commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 25, 2000