Pakhale, Smita Sakharam (CPSO#: 76651)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:Nagpur University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Box 211
Ottawa ON  K1H8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79428
Fax: (613) 739-6807
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 12 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SMITA SAKHARAM PAKHALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAKHALE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2008