Palad, Marcella Marie Suzanne (CPSO#: 73950)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orangeville Family Medicine Centre
Suite 100
1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville ON  L9W 7N7
Phone: (519) 938-8000
Fax: (519) 938-8080
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcella Palad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Palad ( CPSO# 73950 )
Dr. C. Palad Jr ( CPSO# 22879 )

Business Address:
Orangeville Family Medical Centre
100 - 1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville ON  L9W 7N7
Phone Number: (519) 938-8000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCELLA MARIE SUZANNE PALAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001