Palaic, Mladen (CPSO#: 64376)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Nov 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17000 Hymus Boulevard
Kirkland QC  H9J 2W2
Phone: (514) 426-1010
Fax: (514) 426-4018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MLADEN PALAIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALAIC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1996