Palak, Gurpreet (CPSO#: 98737)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 25 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College, Cork, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
McMaster Univeristy
Health Sciences Centre 2V9
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905 521 2100
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GURPREET PALAK shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PALAK is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. PALAK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PALAK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. PALAK shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PALAK is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PALAK no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018