Palathinkal, Darren Matthew (CPSO#: 100482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Case Western Reserve University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 1253
Fax: (613) 548-6042
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARREN MATTHEW PALATHINKAL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PALATHINKAL is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. PALATHINKAL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PALATHINKAL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. PALATHINKAL shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PALATHINKAL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PALATHINKAL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018