Palayew, Karen S (CPSO#: 60246)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
505 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K1S 3P6
Phone: (613) 230-5958
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN S PALAYEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALAYEW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 6 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989