Palcu, Sorin (CPSO#: 81310)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
3251 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1T 3W5
Phone: (416) 297-1693
Fax: (416) 297-4870
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sorin Palcu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Palcu ( CPSO# 81310 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
3251 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1T 3W5
Phone Number: (416) 297-1693

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SORIN PALCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALCU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2006