Palencar, Adriana (CPSO#: 71469)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 1999

Summary

Former Name: Palencar-Frost, Adriana (used until: 20 Mar 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Fax: (905) 373-6933
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 2100 or 3100 or BUCC (1stFlr)
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Canada
Phone: (905) 623-0323
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville, Ontario
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 623-3331
Fax: 905-697-4689
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford, Ontario
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Canada
Phone: 705-653-1140
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adriana Palencar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Palencar ( CPSO# 71469 )

Business Address:
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
3100 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-0323

Business Address:
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIANA PALENCAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALENCAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1999