Paley, Dror (CPSO#: 31990)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew, Italian, Russian, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Paley Orthopedic & Spine
Institute
Kimmel Building
901 45th Street
West Palm Beach FL  33407
United States
Phone: (561) 844-5255
Fax: (561) 844-5245

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - Maryland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DROR PALEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1980
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Jan 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2010