Paliga, Andrzej Henryk (CPSO#: 62255)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 May 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Nov 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Calgary, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
QCH
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: 613 721-2000 Ext. 2900
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.H. Paliga Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 6 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 17 Nov 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 17 Nov 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from November 17, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Andrzej Henryk
            Paliga, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Paliga to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Paliga may only practise as a surgical assistant under the direction
                  of a qualified surgeon.