Pallandi, Derek Vello (CPSO#: 68950)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
1920 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3E2
Phone: (416) 528-8501
Fax: (416) 658-4952
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ontario Shores Centre for
Mental Health Scienced
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Canada
Phone: (905) 430-4055 Ext. 6797
Fax: 905 444 4439
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK VELLO PALLANDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALLANDI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000